NV SB489 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Legislative Commission to appoint a committee to conduct an interim study concerning property taxes. (BDR S-1164)
Title
Directs the Legislative Commission to appoint a committee to conduct an interim study concerning property taxes. (BDR S-1164)
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Notice of exemption. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/history.cfm?ID=1031 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB489.pdf |