NV SB483 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Creates a procedure for the establishment of paternity in proceedings concerning a child in need of protection. (BDR 38-344)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates a procedure for the establishment of paternity in proceedings concerning a child in need of protection. (BDR 38-344)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-27Assembly(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
2017-05-22AssemblyPlaced on Chief Clerk's desk.
2017-05-22AssemblyTaken from General File.
2017-05-19AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-18AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-17AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-16AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-15AssemblyRead second time.
2017-05-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-04-19AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2017-04-19AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-04-19SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-04-19SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-18SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 289.) To printer.
2017-04-18SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-18SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-29SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-27SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback