NV SB483 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 487.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to governmental financial administration. (BDR 32-1182)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to governmental financial administration. (BDR 32-1182)

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-09SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 487.
2015-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-06-01SenateAssembly Amendment No. 1039 concurred in. To enrollment.
2015-05-31SenateIn Senate.
2015-05-31AssemblyTo Senate.
2015-05-31AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2015-05-31AssemblyTo printer.
2015-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 10, Excused: 2.)
2015-05-31AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2015-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1039.)
2015-05-31AssemblyAmendment No. 1017 not adopted.
2015-05-31AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2015-05-31AssemblyTaken from Chief Clerk's desk.
2015-05-30AssemblyPlaced on Chief Clerk's desk.
2015-05-30AssemblyTaken from General File.
2015-05-29AssemblyRead second time.
2015-05-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-05-18AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.
2015-05-18AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-05-16SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To Assembly.
2015-05-15SenateTo printer.
2015-05-15SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.)
2015-05-15SenateDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2015-05-15SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2015-05-15SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 685.)
2015-05-14SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-04-10SenateWaiver granted effective: April 10, 2015
2015-03-30SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2015-03-25SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2015-03-23SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/history.cfm?ID=1034
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/SB/SB483.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/SB/SB483_R1.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/SB/SB483_R2.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/SB/SB483_EN.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=737&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=483&fldBillname=SB483
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1236&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=483&fldBillname=SB483
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1236&fldReprint=2&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=483&fldBillname=SB483

Bill Comments

feedback