NV SB482 | 2015 | 78th Legislature


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 515.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]


Makes various changes relating to elected county officers. (BDR 20-1117)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Makes various changes relating to elected county officers. (BDR 20-1117)


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2015-06-10SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 515.
2015-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-06-01SenateTo enrollment.
2015-06-01SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2015-06-01SenateTo printer.
2015-05-31SenateConference report adopted by Assembly.
2015-05-31SenateConference report adopted by Senate.
2015-05-31SenateFrom committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 930 and further amend.
2015-05-30SenateConference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.
2015-05-29SenateIn Senate.
2015-05-28AssemblyTo Senate.
2015-05-28AssemblyAssembly Amendment No. 930 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly.
2015-05-28AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-05-27SenateAssembly Amendment No. 930 not concurred in. To Assembly.
2015-05-25SenateIn Senate.
2015-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 22, Nays: 20.) To Senate.
2015-05-22AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-05-21AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 930.) To printer.
2015-05-21AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2015-05-21AssemblyTaken from Chief Clerk's desk.
2015-05-06AssemblyPlaced on Chief Clerk's desk.
2015-05-06AssemblyTaken from General File.
2015-05-05AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2015-05-04AssemblyRead second time.
2015-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-04-10AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2015-04-10AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-04-08SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2015-04-07SenateRead second time.
2015-04-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-03-25SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2015-03-23SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

Bill Comments