NV SB48 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-30 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-30 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to permitting and enforcement of standards for oversize and overweight vehicles operating on Nevada highways. (BDR 43-485)
Title
Revises provisions relating to permitting and enforcement of standards for oversize and overweight vehicles operating on Nevada highways. (BDR 43-485)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-30 | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.) | |
2011-05-30 | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2011-05-30 | Taken from General File. | |
2011-05-30 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . | |
2011-05-29 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 671.) To printer. | |
2011-05-29 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-05-29 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-27 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee. | |
2011-04-27 | In Assembly. | |
2011-04-27 | To Assembly. | |
2011-04-27 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-26 | To printer. | |
2011-04-26 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 14, Nays: 7.) | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on General File. | |
2011-04-26 | Reprinting dispensed with. | |
2011-04-26 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 266.) | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-04-26 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-02-07 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2010-12-17 | From printer. | |
2010-12-15 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer. |