NV SB478 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 581.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to certain disciplinary action against state employees. (BDR 23-1043)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to certain disciplinary action against state employees. (BDR 23-1043)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-13SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 581.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateAssembly Amendment No. 1101 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate.
2017-06-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 7.) To Senate.
2017-06-03AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-03AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2017-06-03AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1101.) To printer.
2017-06-03AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-31SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To Assembly.
2017-05-31SenateTo printer.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 5.)
2017-05-31SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1021.)
2017-05-31SenatePlaced on General File.
2017-05-31SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-18SenateExemption effective.
2017-04-18SenateTaken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
2017-04-17SenateRead second time.
2017-04-17SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-04-12SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-29SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-27SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback