NV SB474 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 535.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Makes various changes concerning the professional development of teachers, school administrators and other educational personnel. (BDR 34-1183)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various changes concerning the professional development of teachers, school administrators and other educational personnel. (BDR 34-1183)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-11SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 535.
2015-06-01SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-05-30SenateAssembly Amendment No. 910 concurred in. To enrollment.
2015-05-29SenateIn Senate.
2015-05-28AssemblyTo Senate.
2015-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 9.)
2015-05-27AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2015-05-27AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
2015-05-26AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 910.) To printer.
2015-05-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-05-18AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
2015-05-18AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-05-15SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2015-05-15SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2015-05-14SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 778 and 779.) To printer.
2015-05-13SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-04-16SenateExemption effective.
2015-04-16SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2015-04-16SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2015-04-16SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 352.)
2015-04-16SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2015-04-16SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-03-30SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2015-03-25SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2015-03-23SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback