NV SB451 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 583.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Makes various changes relating to criminal justice. (BDR 14-1007)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various changes relating to criminal justice. (BDR 14-1007)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-14SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 583.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateAssembly Amendment No. 1130 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate.
2017-06-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 3.) To Senate.
2017-06-04AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-04AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
2017-06-04AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1130.) To printer.
2017-06-04AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-06-04AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-06-02AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To committee.
2017-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-06-02SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly.
2017-06-02SenateTo printer.
2017-06-02SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
2017-06-02SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2017-06-02SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 995.)
2017-06-02SenatePlaced on General File.
2017-06-02SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-21SenateExemption effective.
2017-04-21SenateTaken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
2017-04-21SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-20SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 331.) To printer.
2017-04-20SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-12SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-29SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-27SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback