NV SB450 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 493.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to school facilities; temporarily authorizing the boards of trustees of school districts with prior voter approval to issue general obligation bonds in certain circumstances; temporarily revising provisions governing the transfer of certain revenue to the fund for capital projects of such a school district; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to the financing of school facilities. (BDR 30-1153)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 493.
2021-06-02SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2021-05-31SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2021-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 11.) To Senate.
2021-05-29AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2021-05-28AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2021-05-27AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2021-05-26AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2021-05-26AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2021-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2021-05-21AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
2021-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly.
2021-05-20SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 4, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2021-05-19SenateRead second time.
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-05-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2021-05-18SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2021-05-17SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback