NV SB444 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 428.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions governing civil actions. (BDR 3-1137)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing civil actions. (BDR 3-1137)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-08SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 428.
2015-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-06-02SenateTo enrollment.
2015-06-02SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint .
2015-06-02SenateTo printer.
2015-06-01SenateConference report adopted by Assembly.
2015-06-01SenateConference report adopted by Senate.
2015-06-01SenateFrom committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 861 and further amend.
2015-06-01SenateConference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.
2015-06-01SenateIn Senate.
2015-05-31AssemblyAssembly Amendment No. 861 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.
2015-05-28AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-05-27SenateAssembly Amendment No. 861 not concurred in. To Assembly.
2015-05-25SenateIn Senate.
2015-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 3, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2015-05-22AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2015-05-21AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 861.) To printer.
2015-05-21AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2015-05-21AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-04-16AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2015-04-16AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-04-15SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2015-04-15SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-04-14SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 346.) To printer.
2015-04-14SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2015-04-14SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-03-24SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2015-03-23SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback