NV SB441 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 342.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 342.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation; revising provisions governing the issuance of permits for sellers of tangible personal property; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing the issuance and renewal of a seller's permit. (BDR 32-1077)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 342. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.) To Senate. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | To printer. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 810.) |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Action of refusal of passage reconsidered. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) |
2021-05-27 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | To printer. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 758.) |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer. |