NV SB44 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Chapter 522.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Chapter 522.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to behavioral health; requiring an alternate means for an applicant for certain licenses and certificates to submit official transcripts if certain conditions are satisfied; requiring the adoption of regulations that authorize the remote supervision of certain persons; requiring licensing boards that regulate various professions relating to behavioral health to report certain information; revising provisions governing certain licenses by endorsement; providing for the issuance of a license as a master social worker to an applicant who meets certain qualifications; authorizing a master social worker or independent social worker to engage in certain activities; prescribing required documentation for an applicant for a license to engage in social work who is the graduate of a foreign college or university; authorizing the Board of Examiners for Social Workers to place a license to engage in social work on inactive status and refuse to issue a license under certain circumstances; requiring an employee of the Board to submit a complaint against a licensee to the Board under certain circumstances; prohibiting a person from engaging in the unlicensed practice of social work; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing behavioral health professionals. (BDR 54-428)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | Senate | Chapter 522. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 637 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | To printer. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 7, Absent: 1.) |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 637.) |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2020-12-15 | Senate | From printer. |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |