NV SB435 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 398.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to claims for mental or physical injury; authorizing a party to void a release of liability under certain circumstances; enacting provisions relating to the exchange of medical and insurance information by certain persons involved in a claim for mental or physical injury asserted under a policy of insurance covering motor vehicles; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts provisions relating to claims for mental or physical injury. (BDR 2-1148)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 398.
2019-06-02SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-31SenateAssembly Amendment Nos. 720 and 920 concurred in. To enrollment.
2019-05-27SenateIn Senate.
2019-05-27AssemblyTo Senate.
2019-05-27AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
2019-05-24AssemblyTo printer.
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 12, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.)
2019-05-24AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 920.)
2019-05-23AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-23AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2019-05-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 720.) To printer.
2019-05-22AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-19AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-19AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-18SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-04-18SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-17SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 321.) To printer.
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-26SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-25SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback