NV SB433 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 390.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to guardianships. (BDR 13-487)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to guardianships. (BDR 13-487)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-05SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 390.
2017-05-30SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-05-29SenateAssembly Amendment No. 790 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-05-26SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 7, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
2017-05-25AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2017-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 790.) To printer.
2017-05-23AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-23AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-26AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2017-04-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-04-25SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.
2017-04-25SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-24SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 484.) To printer.
2017-04-24SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-28SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-27SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback