NV SB430 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to the Achievement School District and makes various other changes relating to public schools. (BDR 34-793)
Title
Revises provisions relating to the Achievement School District and makes various other changes relating to public schools. (BDR 34-793)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2017-06-04 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2017-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1080.) To printer. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Education. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Finance. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |