NV SB430 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 427.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 427.
Summary
Transfers money from the Trust Fund for Public Health and the Fund for a Healthy Nevada to the State General Fund. (BDR S-1214)
Title
Transfers money from the Trust Fund for Public Health and the Fund for a Healthy Nevada to the State General Fund. (BDR S-1214)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-03 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 427. | |
2009-05-29 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-28 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-27 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-27 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-05-22 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. | |
2009-05-22 | Notice of exemption. | |
2009-05-22 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-21 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-21 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-21 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-05-20 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-05-20 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=1154 |