NV SB427 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 396.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 396.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to business entities; revising provisions governing the resignation of registered agents; revising provisions governing the records kept by a corporation and made available for inspection to certain persons; revising provisions concerning certain distributions to stockholders; revising provisions governing meetings of stockholders of corporations; authorizing the removal of a director of a corporation under certain circumstances; revising provisions relating to the appointment of a receiver for a private corporation; establishing the appointment of a receiver for a limited-liability company; revising the definition of sales representative for purposes relating to securities; revising provisions relating to limitations on the right of a stockholder to dissent; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to business entities. (BDR 7-306)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 396. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 252.) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-14 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |