NV SB426 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to property; requiring the Housing Division of the Department of Business and Industry to annually calculate and publish a cost-of-living increase; establishing certain requirements relating to increases in rent; authorizing a landlord to apply for an exemption to certain requirements relating to increases in rent; providing certain remedies for a violation of certain requirements relating to increases in rent; prohibiting a landlord from taking certain retaliatory actions against a tenant; revising provisions relating to notices of increases in rent; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing rent increases. (BDR 10-15)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 315.) Taken from General File. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |