NV SB421 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 429.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 429.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Office of Science, Innovation and Technology in the Office of the Governor; revising the status of the Director of the Office from employment in the nonclassified service of the State to employment in the unclassified service of the State; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises the employment status of the Director of the Office of Science, Innovation and Technology in the Office of the Governor. (BDR 18-1071)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 429. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 3, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |