NV SB419 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts sales of certain durable medical equipment, oxygen delivery equipment and mobility enhancing equipment from sales and use taxes. (BDR 32-325)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts sales of certain durable medical equipment, oxygen delivery equipment and mobility enhancing equipment from sales and use taxes. (BDR 32-325)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06Senate(No further action taken.)
2017-04-25SenateExemption effective.
2017-04-25SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-24SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2017-04-24SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 161.)
2017-04-24SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-04SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-22SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-20SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback