NV SB418 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-18 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to dairy products; requiring an owner or operator of a food establishment in which certified raw milk and products are sold to ensure proper storage and post certain health warnings; revising requirements for the labeling of and warning regarding certified raw milk; removing certain qualifications required for a person to serve as a member of a county milk commission; requiring each county milk commission to adopt certain regulations governing the production, distribution and sale of certified raw milk; providing that raw milk certified by the county milk commission of the county in which it was produced may be sold anywhere in this State; removing certain limitations of the sale or dispensing of raw milk; providing an exemption from certain requirements relating to raw milk for certain owners of dairy cows, sheep or goats; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing the distribution and sale of raw milk. (BDR 51-1073)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-18Assembly(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
2019-04-25AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2019-04-25AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-23SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 5.) To Assembly.
2019-04-23SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-22SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 358.) To printer.
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-14SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-03-22SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-21SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback