NV SB418 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to air pollution. (BDR 40-970)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to air pollution. (BDR 40-970)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06Assembly(No further action taken.)
2017-06-04AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
2017-06-04AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-06-03SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly.
2017-06-03SenateTo printer.
2017-06-03SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.)
2017-06-03SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2017-06-03SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1120.)
2017-06-03SenatePlaced on General File.
2017-06-03SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-20SenateExemption effective.
2017-04-20SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-19SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2017-04-19SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 349.)
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.
2017-04-04SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-22SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-20SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback