NV SB415 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 389.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 389.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes to exempt sales of feminine hygiene products from sales and use taxes and analogous taxes. (BDR 32-631)
Title
Proposes to exempt sales of feminine hygiene products from sales and use taxes and analogous taxes. (BDR 32-631)
Sponsors
Sen. Yvanna Cancela [D] | Sen. Joyce Woodhouse [D] | Rep. Sandra Jauregui [D] | Rep. Daniele Monroe-Moreno [D] |
Rep. Ellen Spiegel [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 389. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 878 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 2, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 878.) To printer. |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer. |