NV SB411 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 425.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 425.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the imposition of certain taxes in a county to fund capital projects of the school district based on the recommendations of a Public Schools Overcrowding and Repair Needs Committee and voter approval. (BDR S-140)
Title
Allows the imposition of certain taxes in a county to fund capital projects of the school district based on the recommendations of a Public Schools Overcrowding and Repair Needs Committee and voter approval. (BDR S-140)
Sponsors
Sen. Debbie Smith [D] | Rep. Teresa Benitez-Thompson [D] | Rep. Patrick Hickey [R] | Rep. Amber Joiner [D] |
Rep. Michael Sprinkle [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 425. |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 819 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2015-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) To Senate. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Amendment No. 947 not adopted. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 819.) To printer. |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-04-24 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee. |
2015-04-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 512.) To printer. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer. |