NV SB409 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 469.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions related to gaming. (BDR 41-1041)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions related to gaming. (BDR 41-1041)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-09SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 469.
2015-05-28SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-05-25SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2015-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 3.) To Senate.
2015-05-21AssemblyRead second time.
2015-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-04-15AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2015-04-15AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-04-14SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2015-04-14SenateDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2015-04-14SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-04-14SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 285.) To printer.
2015-04-13SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-03-20SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2015-03-17SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback