NV SB403 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 465.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 465.
Summary
Revises provisions relating to state financial administration. (BDR S-1264)
Title
Revises provisions relating to state financial administration. (BDR S-1264)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-04 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 465. | |
2009-06-02 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-06-01 | To enrollment. | |
2009-06-01 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-06-01 | To printer. | |
2009-06-01 | Conference report adopted by Assembly. | |
2009-06-01 | Conference report adopted by Senate. | |
2009-06-01 | From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 955 and further amend. | |
2009-05-31 | Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee. | |
2009-05-30 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-30 | Assembly Amendment No. 955 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate. | |
2009-05-29 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | Assembly Amendment No. 955 not concurred in. To Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-28 | To Senate. | |
2009-05-28 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-05-28 | To printer. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) | |
2009-05-28 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-28 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2009-05-28 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 955.) | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-28 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-05-01 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. | |
2009-05-01 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-30 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-29 | Read second time. | |
2009-04-28 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-03 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-04-02 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=1071 |