NV SB397 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 419.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 419.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to protection of children; requiring the Division of Child and Family Services of the Department of Health and Human Services to establish the Extended Young Adult Support Services Program to provide extended youth support services to certain persons between 18 and 21 years of age; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to certain persons who remain in foster care beyond the age of 18 years. (BDR 38-502)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 419. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 2.) To Senate. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-30 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2021-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | To printer. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 826.) |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | To printer. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 285.) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |