NV SB396 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 259.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to industrial hemp. (BDR 49-53)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to industrial hemp. (BDR 49-53)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-01SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 259.
2017-05-26SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-05-24SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2017-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 5, Excused: 2, Not voting: 1.) To Senate.
2017-05-22AssemblyRead second time.
2017-05-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-04-26AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee.
2017-04-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-04-25SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Absent: 1.) To Assembly.
2017-04-25SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-24SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 330.) To printer.
2017-04-24SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-22SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-20SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback