NV SB394 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-02 - Chapter 504.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-02 - Chapter 504.
Summary
Makes various changes to provisions relating to off-highway vehicles. (BDR 43-501)
Title
Makes various changes to provisions relating to off-highway vehicles. (BDR 43-501)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-02 | Chapter 504. | |
2009-06-02 | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. | |
2009-06-01 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-31 | To Senate. | |
2009-05-31 | Bill read. Veto not sustained. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 6.) | |
2009-05-31 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-31 | To Assembly. | |
2009-05-31 | Bill read. Veto not sustained. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) | |
2009-05-31 | Made Special Order of Business for Sunday, May 31, 2009, at 8:30 p.m. | |
2009-05-28 | Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message. | |
2009-05-26 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2009-05-23 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-22 | Assembly Amendment No. 879 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-21 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-21 | To Senate. | |
2009-05-21 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-21 | To printer. | |
2009-05-21 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 6, Excused: 2.) | |
2009-05-21 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2009-05-21 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 879.) | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-05-21 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-05-19 | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. | |
2009-05-19 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-05-19 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-19 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-05-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee. | |
2009-05-16 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-16 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 1, Absent: 1, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-16 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-05-16 | From committee: Do pass, as amended. | |
2009-04-15 | Exemption effective. | |
2009-04-15 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. | |
2009-04-14 | Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer. | |
2009-04-14 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 234.) | |
2009-04-13 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-02 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2009-03-24 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-23 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=1040 |