NV SB390 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 446.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 446.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to behavioral health; providing for the establishment of a suicide prevention and behavioral health crisis hotline; exempting a telecommunications provider from certain damages relating to the hotline; requiring the imposition of a surcharge on certain communications services to support the hotline; creating the Fund for a Resilient Nevada; requiring the Attorney General to deposit the proceeds of certain litigation into the Fund; authorizing the Department of Health and Human Services to use the money in the Fund for certain statewide projects and to award grants to various public and private entities to address the impact of opioid use disorder and other substance use disorders; prescribing certain procedures relating to the awarding of those grants; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to behavioral health. (BDR 39-635)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 446. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 7.) To Senate. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. To Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | To printer. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 692.) |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | To Secretary's desk. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | To printer. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 689.) |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Health and Human Services. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 284.) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |