NV SB39 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 91.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 91.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to appraisers; incorporating various requirements provided in section 1473 of the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act that govern appraisers who are certified or licensed in this State and appraisal management companies that are registered in this State; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing appraisers and appraisal management companies. (BDR 54-224)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 91. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | To enrollment. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 2, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 58.) To printer. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-21 | Senate | From printer. |
2018-11-19 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |