NV SB382 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-15 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to parental notification for certain abortions. (BDR 40-848)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to parental notification for certain abortions. (BDR 40-848)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-15Senate(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
2017-04-07SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-22SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-20SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback