NV SB38 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Chapter 414. (Effective October 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Chapter 414. (Effective October 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes; prohibiting certain employees of or volunteers at a school from contacting or communicating with a pupil under certain circumstances; prohibiting certain employees of or volunteers at a school from engaging in conduct intended to cause or encourage a pupil to engage in sexual conduct, transmit or distribute a sexual image of the pupil or engage in certain other behavior; prohibiting a court from ordering a victim or witness of such conduct to be subject to a psychological or psychiatric examination; providing that certain persons who are convicted of engaging in such conduct are subject to various statutory provisions relating to electronic communications devices; revising provisions relating to the licensure and employment of persons convicted of engaging in certain prohibited conduct with pupils; providing penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to offenses against children. (BDR 15-425)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-15 | Senate | Chapter 414. (Effective October 1, 2023) |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 591 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2023-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 591.) To printer. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 417.) To printer. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2022-12-01 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-11-16 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |