NV SB38 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 148.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 148.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to legal services; establishing certain provisions applicable to pro bono contracts for legal services entered into by the Attorney General or any other officer, agency or employee in the Executive Department of the State Government; requiring the Attorney General to prepare and submit an annual report concerning such contracts; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Establishes provisions governing the retention of pro bono legal assistance by the Office of the Attorney General. (BDR 18-409)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Senate | Chapter 148. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 15, Not voting: 1.) To Senate. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) To Assembly. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 14.) To printer. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2020-12-14 | Senate | From printer. |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |