NV SB376 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 447.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to motor carriers. (BDR 58-632)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to motor carriers. (BDR 58-632)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-09SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 447.
2015-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-06-03SenateTo enrollment.
2015-06-03SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2015-06-03SenateTo printer.
2015-06-01SenateConference report adopted by Assembly.
2015-06-01SenateConference report adopted by Senate.
2015-06-01SenateFrom committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 810 and further amend.
2015-05-30SenateConference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.
2015-05-29SenateIn Senate.
2015-05-28AssemblyTo Senate.
2015-05-28AssemblyAssembly Amendment No. 810 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly.
2015-05-27AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-05-26SenateAssembly Amendment No. 810 not concurred in. To Assembly.
2015-05-21SenateIn Senate.
2015-05-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 13, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2015-05-20AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-05-19AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 810.) To printer.
2015-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-04-08AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.
2015-04-08AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-04-07SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2015-04-06SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2015-04-03SenateRead second time.
2015-04-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-03-19SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2015-03-17SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback