NV SB376 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 524.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 524.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the penalty for certain technological crimes. (BDR 15-1000)
Title
Increases the penalty for certain technological crimes. (BDR 15-1000)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 524. | |
2011-06-13 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-06-06 | Assembly Amendment No. 732 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2011-06-02 | In Senate. | |
2011-05-30 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 2, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2011-05-29 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-05-28 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-05-28 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . | |
2011-05-27 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 732.) To printer. | |
2011-05-27 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-25 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2011-04-25 | In Assembly. | |
2011-04-22 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-04-20 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-04-19 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-04-18 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-04-18 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-15 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 164.) To printer. | |
2011-04-14 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-03-23 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-21 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |