NV SB375 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 305.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes agreements between the Governor and Indian tribes in this State relating to the regulation of the use of marijuana. (BDR 18-321)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes agreements between the Governor and Indian tribes in this State relating to the regulation of the use of marijuana. (BDR 18-321)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-02SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 305.
2017-05-29SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-05-23SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2017-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 3, Excused: 1, Not voting: 1.) To Senate.
2017-05-22AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2017-05-22AssemblyTaken from Chief Clerk's desk.
2017-05-19AssemblyPlaced on Chief Clerk's desk.
2017-05-19AssemblyTaken from General File.
2017-05-19AssemblyRead second time.
2017-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-04-26AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2017-04-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-04-25SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. Preamble adopted, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-04-25SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-24SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 299.) To printer.
2017-04-24SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-22SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-20SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/history.cfm?ID=836
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB375.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB375_R1.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB375_EN.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=375&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=375&fldBillname=SB375
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=816&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=375&fldBillname=SB375
Roll Callhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=375&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=54&fldBillname=AB54
Roll Callhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=816&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=54&fldBillname=AB54

Bill Comments

feedback