NV SB374 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Assembly Amendment No. 713 concurred in. To enrollment.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to the use of marijuana or industrial hemp. (BDR 40-185)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to the use of marijuana or industrial hemp. (BDR 40-185)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-24SenateAssembly Amendment No. 713 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-05-23SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 14, Excused: 1, Not voting: 1.) To Senate.
2017-05-19AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-18AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-18AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
2017-05-17AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 713.) To printer.
2017-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-26AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2017-04-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-04-26SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly.
2017-04-25SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Printer.
2017-04-25SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2017-04-25SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 625.)
2017-04-25SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-24SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 278.) To printer.
2017-04-24SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-22SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-20SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/history.cfm?ID=835
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB374.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB374_R1.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB374_R2.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB374_R3.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB374_EN.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=462&fldReprint=2&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=374&fldBillname=SB374
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=462&fldReprint=2&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=56&fldBillname=SB56
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=845&fldReprint=3&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=374&fldBillname=SB374

Bill Comments

feedback