NV SB374 | 2013 | 77th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 547.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the registration of medical marijuana establishments authorized to cultivate or dispense marijuana or manufacture edible marijuana products or marijuana-infused products for sale to persons authorized to engage in the medical use of marijuana. (BDR 15-89)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the registration of medical marijuana establishments authorized to cultivate or dispense marijuana or manufacture edible marijuana products or marijuana-infused products for sale to persons authorized to engage in the medical use of marijuana. (BDR 15-89)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-12SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 547.
2013-06-06SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2013-06-03SenateAssembly Amendment No. 961 concurred in. To enrollment.
2013-06-03SenateIn Senate.
2013-06-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) To Senate.
2013-06-03AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2013-06-03AssemblyTaken from Chief Clerk's desk.
2013-06-03AssemblyPlaced on Chief Clerk's desk.
2013-06-03AssemblyTaken from General File.
2013-06-03AssemblyAction reconsidered.
2013-06-03AssemblyRead third time. Lost. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.)
2013-06-03AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
2013-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 961.) To printer.
2013-06-02AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2013-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2013-05-30AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2013-05-30AssemblyIn Assembly.
2013-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) To Assembly.
2013-05-29SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2013-05-28SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 849.) To printer.
2013-05-28SenatePlaced on General File.
2013-05-28SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2013-04-23SenateTo committee.
2013-04-23SenateExemption effective.
2013-04-23SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2013-04-22SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2013-04-22SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 333.)
2013-04-22SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2013-04-22SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2013-04-04SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2013-03-20SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2013-03-18SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Reports/history.cfm?ID=894
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Bills/SB/SB374.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Bills/SB/SB374_R1.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Bills/SB/SB374_R2.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Bills/SB/SB374_R3.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Bills/SB/SB374_EN.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=2109&fldReprint=2&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=374&fldBillname=SB374
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=2221&fldReprint=3&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=374&fldBillname=SB374
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=2226&fldReprint=3&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=374&fldBillname=SB374

Bill Comments

feedback