NV SB373 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-07 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-07 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires photographic identification for voting. (BDR 24-778)
Title
Requires photographic identification for voting. (BDR 24-778)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-07 | (No further action taken.) | |
2011-04-14 | Exemption effective. | |
2011-04-14 | Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee. | |
2011-04-14 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2011-04-14 | From committee: Without recommendation and rerefer to the Committee on Finance. | |
2011-03-23 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-21 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/76th2011/Reports/history.cfm?ID=890 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/76th2011/Bills/SB/SB373.pdf |