NV SB366 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 395.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 395.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to juvenile justice; authorizing a juvenile court to order a child who has been found incompetent to receive treatment at certain facilities operated by the Division of Child and Family Services of the Department of Health and Human Services; requiring such a facility to accept such a child for treatment; prohibiting a child found to be incompetent from being committed to the custody of a correctional facility; allowing a child found to be incompetent to petition to seal his or her record; requiring the submittal of certain data and information relating to the competency of children; requiring the development and submittal of a plan for the structure of services for the competency of children; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to juvenile competency. (BDR 5-498)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 395. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | To printer. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 727.) |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Taken from General File. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 214 and 440.) |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |