NV SB361 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 496.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 496.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions related to domestic violence. (BDR 53-775)
Title
Revises provisions related to domestic violence. (BDR 53-775)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 496. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 1082 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: None, Excused: 4.) To Senate. |
2017-06-03 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint . |
2017-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1082.) To printer. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | To printer. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 863.) |
2017-05-22 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 700.) To printer. |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Waiver granted effective: April 13, 2017. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Judiciary. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer. |