NV SB354 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 253.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 253.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the use of motorized wheelchairs and the movement of other pedestrians in bicycle lanes under certain circumstances. (BDR 43-894)
Title
Authorizes the use of motorized wheelchairs and the movement of other pedestrians in bicycle lanes under certain circumstances. (BDR 43-894)
Sponsors
Sen. Moises Denis [D] | Sen. Mark Manendo [D] | Sen. Scott Hammond [R] | Sen. Joyce Woodhouse [D] |
Rep. Nelson Araujo [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-27 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 253. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 412.) To printer. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer. |