NV SB350 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 566.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions governing the installation and use of certain technology devices in a motor vehicle. (BDR 52-575)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing the installation and use of certain technology devices in a motor vehicle. (BDR 52-575)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 566.
2017-06-01SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-05-30SenateAssembly Amendment No. 828 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-05-29SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-29AssemblyTo Senate.
2017-05-29AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
2017-05-26AssemblyTo printer.
2017-05-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 24, Nays: 17, Excused: 1.)
2017-05-26AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2017-05-26AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 828.)
2017-05-26AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-26AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.
2017-04-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-04-26SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly.
2017-04-25SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Printer.
2017-04-25SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2017-04-25SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 616.)
2017-04-25SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-24SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 379.) To printer.
2017-04-24SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-22SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-20SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback