NV SB330 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 378.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to education. (BDR 34-724)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to education. (BDR 34-724)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-05SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 378.
2015-05-29SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-05-27SenateAssembly Amendment No. 750 concurred in. To enrollment.
2015-05-25SenateIn Senate.
2015-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2015-05-22AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
2015-05-21AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 750.) To printer.
2015-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-04-24AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
2015-04-24AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-04-21SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2015-04-21SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2015-04-21SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 635.) To printer.
2015-04-21SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-04-20SenateTo printer.
2015-04-20SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 496.)
2015-04-20SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2015-04-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-03-18SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2015-03-16SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback