NV SB327 | 2017 | 79th Legislature


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]


Revises provisions relating to elections. (BDR 24-22)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Revises provisions relating to elections. (BDR 24-22)



2017-06-06Senate(No further action taken.)
2017-04-11SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective.
2017-04-11SenateFrom committee: Re-refer to Committee on Finance.
2017-04-04SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-21SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-20SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

Bill Comments