NV SB325 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to adoption; establishing the Nevada Child Adoption Grant Program to provide grants to assist certain prospective adoptive parents with certain costs of adoption; establishing a credit against the modified business tax for taxpayers who donate money to the Nevada Child Adoption Grant Program; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Nevada Child Adoption Grant Program to provide grants to assist certain prospective adoptive parents with certain costs of adoption. (BDR 11-163)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Senate(No further action taken.)
2019-04-15SenateExemption effective.
2019-04-15SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
2019-04-15SenateFrom committee: Re-refer to Committee on Finance.
2019-04-05SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-03-20SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-18SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback