NV SB325 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 219.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 219.
Summary
Authorizes hospitals to establish a program concerning methicillin-resistant Staphylococcus aureus. (BDR S-42)
Title
Authorizes hospitals to establish a program concerning methicillin-resistant Staphylococcus aureus. (BDR S-42)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 219. | |
2009-05-20 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-19 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-16 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-15 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-15 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-17 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. | |
2009-04-17 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-16 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-16 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-15 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 261.) To printer. | |
2009-04-14 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-18 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=901 |