NV SB321 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 403.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 403.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts a Homeowner's Bill of Rights. (BDR 9-748)
Title
Enacts a Homeowner's Bill of Rights. (BDR 9-748)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 403. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Assembly Amendment Nos. 684 and 822 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint . |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 822.) To printer. |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 684.) To printer. |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 547.) To printer. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |