NV SB312 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 592.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to employment; requiring an employer in private employment to provide paid leave to each employee of the employer under certain circumstances; providing certain exceptions; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires an employer in private employment to provide paid leave to employees under certain circumstances. (BDR 53-888)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13SenateChapter 592.
2019-06-12SenateApproved by the Governor.
2019-05-30SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-28SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2019-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 9, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-27AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-27AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2019-05-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2019-05-16AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-05-15SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-05-15SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
2019-05-14SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 693.) To printer.
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on General File.
2019-05-14SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-22SenateExemption effective.
2019-04-22SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2019-04-19SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2019-04-19SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 482.)
2019-04-19SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-14SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-03-19SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-18SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback